This dataset includes 1.41 million licenses issued wtih Connecticut Department of Consumer Protection (TDLR).
Licensee Name | Office Address | Credential | Effective / Expiration |
---|---|---|---|
Donald R Small · Drs Architects & Planners | 1114 Lost Creek Blvd Ste 280, Austin, TX 78746 | Architect | 2020-08-01 ~ 2021-07-31 |
Joan K Clayton | 1106 Blackacre Trail, Austin, TX 78746 | Psychologist | 2020-06-01 ~ 2021-05-31 |
Compound Money Fund, L.p. | 1400 Spyglass Dr, Austin, TX 78746 | Securities - Exemptions | 2020-04-15 ~ |
Dolce Vita At Cibolo Owner LLC | 1301 S Capital of Texas Highway, #b-201, Austin, TX 78746 | Securities - Exemptions | 2020-04-09 ~ |
Dfa Investment Dimensions Group, Inc. | 6300 Bee Cave Road, Austin, TX 78746 | Investment Company - Open End | 2019-12-31 ~ 2020-12-31 |
Kelsey Elaine Wilkes | 3711 S. Mo Pac Expy Bldg 2, Austin, TX 78746 | Registered Nurse | 2019-12-01 ~ 2020-11-30 |
Aic Income Find II Qp Reit, Inc. | 2600 Via Fortuna, Austin, TX 78746 | Securities - Exemptions | 2019-12-06 ~ |
Aero Capital Solutions Fund II, Lp | 3700 N. Capital of Texas Highway, Austin, TX 78746 | Securities - Exemptions | 2019-11-20 ~ |
Whc Lake Creek Parkway, Lp | 3267 Bee Caves Road, Austin, TX 78746 | Securities - Exemptions | 2019-09-09 ~ |
Steven Richardson | 108 Wild Basin South Ste 250, Austin, TX 78746 | Physician Assistant | 2019-07-05 ~ 2020-07-31 |
Francisco Henning Gomes | 12 Hull Circle, Austin, TX 78746 | Architect | 2016-08-01 ~ 2017-07-31 |
Apollo Endosurgery Inc | 1120 S. Capital of Tx Highway, Austin, TX 78746 | Out of State Manufacturer of Drugs, Cosmetics & Medical Devices | 2013-05-08 ~ |
Ia Naman&assoc Inc | 5905 Fox Chapel Dr, Austin, TX 78746 | Professional Engineer | 1993-01-15 ~ 1994-01-31 |
Jon L Belsher | Building One, Austin, TX 78746 | Physician/surgeon | 2014-04-01 ~ 2015-03-31 |
Dwayne A Mann · Mann & Mann Architects Inc | 103 Woodview Court, Austin, TX 78746 | Architect | 2013-08-01 ~ 2014-07-31 |
Susan Bushart | 402 Inwood, Austin, TX 78746 | Registered Nurse | 1996-05-20 ~ 1997-05-31 |
Diane D Frost | 4207 Long Champ Dr, Austin, TX 78746 | Registered Nurse | 1996-11-18 ~ 1998-01-31 |
Sharon L Balcezak | 1401 Canoe Brook Dr, Austin, TX 78746 | Registered Nurse | 2007-02-12 ~ 2008-02-29 |
Gail K Acuna | 4600 Wild Briar Pass, Austin, TX 78746 | Registered Nurse | 1998-12-24 ~ 2000-02-29 |
Kathleen A Huff · Unruh | 3902 Laguna Vista Cove, Austin, TX 78746 | Physical Therapist | 2000-02-25 ~ 2001-02-28 |
Earl P Broussard Jr | 906 Live Oak Ridge, Austin, TX 78746 | Landscape Architect | 1998-08-01 ~ 1999-07-31 |
Bilal Omer | 3601 Needles Drive, Austin, TX 78746-1438 | Controlled Substance Registration for Practitioner | 2009-03-01 ~ 2011-02-28 |
Harvey C Hodges | 500 Capital of Texas Hwy N Bldg 7, Austin, TX 78746-3302 | Real Estate Broker | 2020-04-01 ~ 2021-03-31 |
A Glimmer of Hope Foundation | 3600 N Capital of Texas Hwy Bldg B, Austin, TX 78746-3314 | Public Charity | 2019-12-01 ~ 2020-11-30 |
Global Wildlife Conservation | 500 N Capital of Texas Hwy Bldg 1, Austin, TX 78746-3334 | Public Charity | 2020-06-01 ~ 2021-05-31 |
Bat Conservation International Inc. | 500 N Capital of Texas Hwy Bldg 1, Austin, TX 78746-3334 | Public Charity | 2019-10-08 ~ 2020-05-31 |
Young Americans for Liberty Foundation · Yalf | 500 N Capital of Texas Hwy Bldg 5, Austin, TX 78746-3448 | Public Charity | 2019-12-01 ~ 2020-11-30 |
Young Americans for Liberty Inc · Yal | 500 N Capital of Texas Hwy Bldg 5, Austin, TX 78746-3448 | Public Charity | 2019-12-01 ~ 2020-11-30 |
Daniel Alexander Mackay | 609 Furlong Dr, Austin, TX 78746-4128 | Physician/surgeon | 2018-06-01 ~ 2019-05-31 |
Nolen & Associates Pllc | 6836 Fm 2244 Rd Ste 279, Austin, TX 78746-5059 | Certified Public Accountant Firm Permit | 2020-01-01 ~ 2020-12-31 |
Texas Compunding Pharmacy · True Custom Pharmacy | 5300 Bee Cave Rd Ste 100, West Lake Hills, TX 78746-5226 | Nonresident Pharmacy | ~ |
Restless Legs Syndrome Foundation Inc · Willis-ekborn Disease Foundation | 3006 Bee Caves Rd Ste D206, Austin, TX 78746-5579 | Public Charity | 2019-09-01 ~ 2020-08-31 |
1098 Distribution Inc · 1098 Distribution | 901 S Mo Pac Expy # 300, Austin, TX 78746-5776 | Out of State Shipper Beer | 2015-06-06 ~ 2016-06-05 |
American Association of Nurse Practitioners Scholarship and Grant Foundation | 901 S Mo Pac Expy Bldg II, Austin, TX 78746-5776 | Public Charity | 2014-05-20 ~ 2015-11-30 |
Epic Property Solutions, LLC | 901 S Mo Pac Expy Bldg 1 Suite 270, Austin, TX 78746-5776 | Real Estate Appraisal Management Company | 2015-03-10 ~ 2016-12-31 |
1098 Distribution Inc | 901 S Mo Pac Expy Ste 300, Austin, TX 78746-5776 | Out of State Shipper Beer | ~ |
James T Post | 1506 Lost Creek Blvd, Austin, TX 78746-6130 | Plumbing & Piping Unlimited Contractor | ~ |
Edgemont Pharmaceuticals, LLC | 1250 S Capital of Texas Hwy Bldg 3, West Lake Hills, TX 78746-6428 | Out of State Manufacturer of Drugs, Cosmetics & Medical Devices | 2011-10-12 ~ |
Bridget I Mathis | 1034 Liberty Park Dr, Austin, TX 78746-6891 | Dental Hygienist | 2019-09-01 ~ 2020-08-31 |
Kristen L Rodriguez | 1601 S Mo Pac Expy Bldg 2, Austin, TX 78746-7009 | Professional Engineer | 2017-02-01 ~ 2018-01-31 |
Ho-yan Cheung | 1605 Scottish Woods Trl, Austin, TX 78746-7331 | Professional Engineer | 2020-02-01 ~ 2021-01-31 |
William R Schnier | 3625 Peregrine Falcon Dr, Austin, TX 78746-7438 | Professional Engineer | 2020-02-01 ~ 2021-01-31 |
Nulo Inc | 2530 Walsh Tarlton Ln Ste 140, Austin, TX 78746-7779 | Commercial Feed | 2020-01-01 ~ 2020-12-31 |
Andrea Wells | 1781 Spyglass Dr Apt 348, Austin, TX 78746-7920 | Registered Nurse | 2018-08-06 ~ 2019-07-31 |
Brittany L Sayers | 2301 S Mo Pac Expy Apt 337, Austin, TX 78746-7958 | Real Estate Salesperson | 2020-06-01 ~ 2021-05-31 |